This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 16:43:57 (UTC).

TAFT UNION HIGH SCHOOL DIST. VS CITY OF TAFT

Case Summary

On 12/31/2014 TAFT UNION HIGH SCHOOL DIST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CITY OF TAFT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Brumfield, Lorna H. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3804

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAFT UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT

MCDERMOTT, WILLIAM

BROWN, MARILYN

ANGELO, RONA

Defendant

CITY OF TAFT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERR, LEONARD C

Attorney at DOOLEY HERR PEDERSEN & BERGLUND BAILEY

100 Willow Plz #300

Visalia, CA 93291

Defendant Attorneys

PEAKE, LARRY F

EPPERSON, JASON S

 

Court Documents

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 11/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 05/31/17; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F

Case Management Conference

04/27/16 - M.O. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F

Ruling

RULING: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 04:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/25/15 Plaintiffs, Taft Union HIgh School District, William McDermott, Marilyn Brown and Rona Angelo Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Answers to Request for Production Set One ResID: 11676; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F

Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: Cont'd from 8/27/15; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F

Case Management Conference

08/27/2015 - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F

Ruling

06/17/15 - RULING ON DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: RULING ON DEFENDANT CITY OF TAFT'S SPECIAL DEMURRER

Demurrer First Amended Complaint

06/11/15 - DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DEFENDANT, CITY OF TAFT; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F

Demurrer

CV283804 MINUTE ORDER: 2ND MINUTE ORDER: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/10/15 DEFENDANT, CITY OF TAFT DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 05/31/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F

Case Management Conference

11/30/16 - M/O CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C

Motion to Compel

06/23/2016 M.O.: Mtn to Compel Attendance & Production of Docs at Depo of Robert & Leah Cleveland: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 5/16/16, by Plaintiff, Taft Union High School District, William McDermott, Marilyn Brown and Rona Angelo. Motion to Compel Attendance and Production of Documents at Deposition of Leah Cleveland. ResID: 16052.; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C

Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Plaintiff; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: cont'd from 11/22/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Larry F. Peake New Attorney: Jason S. Epperson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Substitution of Attorney: 2b. must state the New legal representatives state bar no. Please correct and resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Case Status Conference 11/22/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Set per Stipulation on 8/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: T/E 7-8 DAYS JURY FOR DEFENDANT (PLAINTIFF WAIVED ABSENT FURHTER ORDER OF THE COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: of Order on Stipulation to Vacate the MSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 10/28/19 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 7-8 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: to Vacate the Mandatory Settlement Conference UPON GOOD CAUSE BEING SHOWN as set forth in the above stipulation of counsel, the Mandatory Settlement Conference on September 27, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Department 17 shall be vacated and reset when a new trial date is scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2015
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: FILED BY LEONARD C. HERR ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • Docket4054 Demurrer - Comment: Created by Attorney Reservation System: Attorney: OLIVER U ROBINSON ESQ, Bar: 37662.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing/Demurrer - Comment: [DEFENDANT CITY OF TAFT'S] TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; FILED BY OLIVER U ROBINSON ESQ; 3/24/15 AT 8:30AM DEPT 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=2750393 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:06/03/2015, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:1, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LHB, SystemDate:1/6/2015 1:35:21 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO CITY OF TAFT; PERSONAL SERVICE ON 01/21/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 03, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 03, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY LEONARD C. HERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY LEONARD C. HERR CMC SET 7/6/15 @8:15AM DEPT 17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.