This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 06:11:04 (UTC).

TAFOLLA ET AL VS GROVER GARDENS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 TAFOLLA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against GROVER GARDENS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Schuett, Stephen D. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1406

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEYVA, JR., FERNANDO

CINTORA, JR, JAIME A.

PEREZ, JR., SERGIO

VILLA, JORGE MARTINEZ

GARCIA, ARTURO P.

RODRIGUEZ, RIGOBERTO CERDA

TAFOLLA, ANTONIO C.

PANIAGUA, MARIA

GALVAN, JOHN

CHAVEZ, ALEJANDRA

PONCE, ANNA ROCIO

ARROYO, DAVID MACIEL

PANIAGUA, ANTONIO

HERNANDEZ, TRINIDAD

MIRANDA, LUIS

GOMEZ, ARNULFO EDGAR

ALVARADO, ADELA F.

MAGANA, OGARIDT ALCAZAR

HERNANDEZ, TERESA LOPEZ

Defendant

GROVER GARDENS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTHRIE, LORI J

Other Attorneys

FELD, JASON DANIEL

CRESPO, DANIEL A

TSANG, KENNETH B.

DAILEY, TIMOTHY P

ARMIJO, MARK S

SCHONEMAN, TINA L

CANO, GINO

FIDGER, ANGELA R

EBNER, DARREN M

PION-GOUREAU, AMANDA E.

RUTHERFORD, KARI L

WALKER, MATHEW L

HUGO, HEIDI K.

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RETURNED VIA MISC ATTORNEY BIN

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE; STIPULATION & ORDER TO ALLOW INTERVENTION RETURNED VIA; FIRST LEGAL

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Alex Frazan Document: Answer to Cross-Complaint and Notice of Jury Deposit Include complex fees of $1000.00, the jury deposit fees of $150.00 and resubmit.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE; STIPULATION & ORDER RETURNED VIA; FIRST LEGAL

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY RETURNED VIA E-FILE

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 03/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont 12/19/17

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL RETURNED VIA E-FILE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS & CROSS COMPLAINT. CROSS-COMPLAINT MISSING POS.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/5/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Lena M. Louis For: Notice of Entry of Order Reason: Document is incomplete. Exhibit mentioned on document is missing.

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement 03/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/25/19 Cross-Defendant, CENTRAL CALIFORNIA CONSTRUCTION, INC. Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement with Cross-Complainant S&S Homes of the Central Coast, Inc, and Grover Gardens, LLC ResID: 34284

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Proposed Order Granting Good Faith Settlement - Duplicate Proposed Order Received for Broken Drum of Bakersfield

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 02/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont 11/09/18

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of change of hearing - no fees

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Cont'd from 03/08/2018 TO BE HEARD AT 8:30 AM NOTE: CMC CONTINUED FROM 8-9-18 TO 11-9-18 PER PRE-TRIAL ORDER EXECUTED 6-19-18

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice:

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: STIPULATION AND COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION RETURNED VIA E-FILE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER. RETURNED VIA E-FILE

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC 3.1385 ( GOBAL SETTLEMENT) **Complaint in Intervention of Arch Specialty Insurance Company is the only one pending at this time***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: as to the Complaint in Intervention of Arch Specialty Insurance Company on behalf of Prime Plumbing - Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With Prejudice as to Cross Compalint of S&S Homes and Grover Gardens.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: Pre-Trial Order No. 10 and Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing Regarding Settlement Compliance Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With Prejudice as to Morton & Brown Plumbing, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to XDeft Broken Drum of Bakersfield, Inc - ONLY - With Prejudice - from the Xcomplaint of S&S Homes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Further Order to Show Cause. Hrg: 8/28/19 @ 8:30 am in Dept.10

    Read MoreRead Less
285 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO S&S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST , INC , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS & CROSS COMPLAINT. CROSS-COMPLAINT MISSING POS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO S&S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC. AND GROVER GARDENS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO GROVER GARDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: Additional Plaintiffs: Ernesto Sigala Jose Solis Dacia Solis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/15/2017; Served: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/5/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Envelope Details Page 2 of 4

Status Accepted

Accepted Date 09/27/2017 04:36:52 PM Fees

Court Fee $2.870.00

Service Fee $0.00

Optional Services >Answer/Response (Civil Unlimited - $435.00 +

Complex Fee $1000.00) $1.435.00 Documents Lead Document Answer to Complaint 9.27.17.pdf |Original] [Transmitted]

Associated Parties

Party/Business Name

GROVER GARDENS. LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY S&S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST. INC.. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Summons

Filing Type EFile

Filing Code Summons

Filing Description Summons on Cross-Complaint

Reference Number Tatolla

Comments

Status Rejected

Fees

Court Fee $0.00

Service Fee $0.00

Rejection Information

Rejection Reason Time Rejection Comment

19 - Rejected ()9/3;//.;2017 No rcjcgtion comment was providc.d.‘l’leasg contact the court ‘ 04:33:37 PM into which you are filing for more informaton.

10 - Proof of 09/27/2017 D NCG o . oL B

Service is required 04:34:32 PM CROSS COMPLAINT HAS BEEN REJECTED

Documents

Lead Document Cross-Complaint (Summons) 9.27.17.pdf [Original]

https://california.tylerhost.net/EnvelopeDctails.aspx?envelopeguid=5dac6ef3-{915-462a-a5... 9/28/2017

SUM-110

e SU Mg‘()o NS;' int (SOLO PARA USO DE LA CORTE) ross-Complain

(CITACION JUDICIAL-CONTRADEMANDA)

NOTICE TO CROSS-DEFENDANT: (AVISO AL CONTRA-DEMANDADO):

ALL AMLERICAN CARPLT, a Partnership; Additional Partics Attachment form attached.

YOU ARE BEING SUED BY CROSS-COMPLAINANT: (LO ESTA DEMANDANDO EL CONTRADEMANDANTE):

S&S HOMLES OF THE CENTRAL COAST. INC. and GROVER GARDENS, LLC,

You have 30 CALENDAR DAYS after this summons and legal papers are served on you to file a written response at this court and have a copy served on the cross-complainant. A letter or phone call will not protect you. Your written response must be in proper legal form if you want the court to hear your case. There may be a court form that you can use for your response. You can find these court forms and more information at the California Courts Online Self-Help Center (www.courtinfo.ca.gov/selfhelp), your county law library, or the courthouse nearest you. If you cannot pay the filing fee, ask the court clerk for a fee waiver form. If you do not file your response on time, you may lose the case by default, and your wages, money, and property may be taken without further warning from the court.

There are other legal requirements. You may want to call an attorney right away. If you do not know an attorney, you may want to call an attorney referral service. If you cannot afford an attorney, you may be eligible for free legal services from a nonprofit legal services program. You can locate these nonprofit groups at the California Legal Services Web site (www.lawhelpcalifornia.org), the California Courts Online Self-Help Center (www.courtinfo.ca.gov/selfhelp), or by contacting your local court or county bar association. NOTE: The court has a statutory lien for waived fees and costs on any settlement or arbitration award of $10,000 or more in a civil case. The court's lien must be paid before the court will dismiss the case.

Tiene 30 DIAS DE CALENDARIO después de que le entreguen esta citacion y papeles legales para presentar una respuesta por esqrito en esta corte y hacer que se entregue una copia al contrademandante. Una carta o una llamada telefonica no lo protegen. Su respuesta por escrito tiene que estar en formato legal correcto si desea que procesen su caso en la corte. Es posible que haya un formulario que usted pueda usar para su respuesta. Puede encontrar estos formularios de la corte y mas informacion en el Centro de Ayuda de las Cortes de California (www.sucorte.ca.gov), en la biblioteca de leyes de su condado o en la corte que le quede mas cerca. Sino puede pagar la cuota de presentacion, pida al secretario de la corte que le de un formulario de exencion de pago de cuotas. Sino presenta su respuesta a tiempo, puede perder el caso por incumplimiento y la corte le podra quitar su sueldo, dinero y bienes sin mas advertencia.

Hay otros requisitos legales. Es recomendable que llame a un abogado inmediatamente. Si no conoce a un abogado, puede llamar a un servicio de remision a abogados. Si no puede pagar a un abogado, es posible que cumpla con los requisitos para obtener servicios legales gratuitos de un programa de servicios legales sin fines de lucro. Puede encontrar estos grupos sin fines de lucro en el sitio web de California Legal Services, (www.lawhelpcalifornia.org), en el Centro de Ayuda de las Cortes de California (www.sucorte.ca.gov), o oniéndose en contacto con la corte o el colegio de abogados locales. AVISO: Por ley, la corte tiene derecho a reclamar las cuotas y los costos exentos por imponer un gravamen sobre cualquier recuperacion de $10,000 6 mas de valor recibida mediante un acuerdo o una concesion de arbitraje en un caso de derecho civil. Tiene que pagar el gravamen de la corte antes de que la corte pueda desechar el caso.

The name and address Of the court is: q- o - - - S—HORTF _N_AME OF CASE ({from Cornplaint). (Nombre de Casc) auE Superior Court of Kern Count . . (El nombre y direccion de la corte es): p Y Tatolla v. Grover Gardens, LLC

CASE NUMBER: (Numero del Caso).

1415 Truxtun Avenue

Bakersficld. CA 93301 BCV-17-101406-SPC

The name, address, and telephone number of cross-complainant's attorney, or cross-complainant without an attorney, is: (El nombre, la direccion y el numero de teléfono del abogado del contrademandante. o del contrademandante que no tiene abogado, es):

Jason Daniel Feld, Kahana & Feld, LLP, 3 Hutton Centre Drive, Suite 685, Santa Ana, CA 92707, 949-812-478

DATE: Clerk, by , Deputy (Fecha) (Secretario) ——— (Adjunto) (For proof of service of this summons, use Proof of Service of Summons (form POS-010).) (Para prueba de entrega de esta citation use el formulario Proof of Service of Summons (POS-010).) NOTICE TO THE PERSON SERVED: You are served [SEAL] 1. ] as an individual cross-defendant. 2. [ ] asthe person sued under the fictitious name of (specify):

3 [ onbehalf of (specify):

under: [__] CCP 416.10 (corporation) [] CCP 416.60 (minor) [ ] CCP 416.20 (defunct corporation) [ ] CCP 416.70 (conservatee) [ ] CCP 416.40 (association or partnership) [ ] CCP 416.80 (authorized person)

[ ] other (specify):

[ ] other (specify): Jason Danicl Feld. Esq. (CSB# 210668) Alex M. Chazen (CSB# 279035) KAHANA & FELD, LLP

Jason Danicl Feld. Esq. (CSB# 210668) Alex M. Chazen (CSB# 279035) KAHANA & FELD, LLP

3 Hutton Centre Dr., Suite 685

Santa Ana, CA 92707

(949) 812-4781:; Fax: (949) 281-2105

ifeld(@ kahanafeld.com

achazent kahanateld.com

Attorneys for Defendants, S&S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC. and GROVER GARDENS, LLC

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF KERN - METROPOLITAN DIVISION

ANTONIO C. TAFOLLA, ct al.,

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF S&S HOMES

OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC. AND GROVER GARDENS, LLC FOR:

Defendants.

S&S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, 1. Total Indemnity; INC. and GROVER GARDENS. LLC, 2. Equitable Indemnity; 3. Implied Indemnity; Cross-Complainants, 4, Contractual Indemnity; V. 5. Breach of Contract - Al; 6. Breach of Contract — Defense; ALL AMERICAN CARPET, a Partnership; 7. Breach of Implied Warranty; AVIA INDUSTRIES, INC., a Califorma 8. Breach of Express Warranty; corporation; 9. Declaratory Relief; BRIAN MAURO CONSTRUCTION, INC. 10. Negligence; and dba NORCAL ELECTRIC, a California 11. Declaratory Relief

corporation;

BROKEN DRUM OF BAKERSFIELD, INC., a Calitornia corporation;

CASKEY CORPORATION dba CENTURY GLASS, a California corporation;

CENTRAL CALIFORNIA

CONSTRUCTION, INC., a California corporation;

CENTRAL VALLEY OVERHEAD DOOR, INC., a California corporation;

CORONEL CONSTRUCTION, INC., a California corporation;

SISEMORE LATH & PLASTER aka DARRIN D. SISEMORE LATH & PLASTER.