This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 10:21:08 (UTC).

T-MOBILE WEST VS COUNTY OF KERN

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 T-MOBILE WEST filed an Other lawsuit against COUNTY OF KERN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bradshaw, J. Eric and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1548

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bradshaw, J. Eric

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

T-MOBILE WEST LLC

Defendants

COUNTY OF KERN

THE STATE BOARD OF EQUALIZATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOERSCH, MARTHA A.

MEITHKE, ERIC J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/21/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: cont'd from 10/21/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment from Judge Lampe to Judge Bradshaw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Comment: Continuing Case Deadlines Having reviewed Plaintiff/Claimant's Notice re Statutory Deadline to Serve Complaint Under Revenue and Taxation Code Section 5147 and good cause having been shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case management conference currently scheduled for January 4, 2022, is continued to September 6, 2022 to allow time for service of the complaint under section 5147 and for the defendants to file a response. If Claimant serves the complaint before the one-year time limit prescribed by section 5147 it will notify the Court and request that the case management conference be rescheduled for an earlier date. IT IS SO ORDERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketRequest - Comment: to Continue and Notice re Statutory Deadline to Serve Complaint Under Revenue and Taxation Code Section 5147

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 10/21/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/21/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE BOARD OF EQUALIZATION is a litigant

Latest cases where T-MOBILE WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boersch, Martha A