This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 07:20:22 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS WOOD

Case Summary

On 08/11/2015 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WOOD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DelPellegrino, Victoria, Woodward, Cory J. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0177

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

DelPellegrino, Victoria

Woodward, Cory J.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

WOOD, MICHELE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENNETT, MARK B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketCase Destroyed Pursuant to Government Code Section - Comment: 68153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DESTRUCTION OF RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • DocketRequest - Comment: TO SET MATTER FOR TRIAL OR CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer(s): DelPellegrino, Victoria, Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketNotice - Comment: OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY AND DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: MICHELLE WOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bennett, Mark B