This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:55:32 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS SAMANTHA GREENE A/K/A SAMANTHA L GREENE

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAMANTHA GREENE A/K/A SAMANTHA L GREENE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5791

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

SAMANTHA GREENE A/K/A SAMANTHA L GREENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, MICHAEL D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Request for Dismissal Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): previously entered on 3/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Samantha Greene aka Samantha L. Greene. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less