This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 07:18:48 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS RAUL CEBALLOS AKA RAUL E CEBALLOS

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAUL CEBALLOS AKA RAUL E CEBALLOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0006

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

RAUL CEBALLOS AKA RAUL E CEBALLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMONSON, TODD C.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SYNCHRONY BANK; Served: 02/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.