This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 07:19:03 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank VS McCain

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against McCain. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

Defendant

McCain, Charles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMONSON, TODD C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Statement of Classification and Location/Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.