This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 07:19:12 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank VS Leming

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Leming. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern River Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pritchard, Kenneth G.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kern River Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

Defendant

Leming, Rodney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMONSON, TODD C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Kern River-Notice of OSC 3.740(f) - Portal:

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Kern River-Notice of OSC 3.740(d) - Portal:

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Kern River-Notice of OSC 3.740(f) - Portal: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Kern River-Notice of OSC 3.740(d) - Portal: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Kern River-Notice of OSC 3.740(f) - Portal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Kern River-Notice of OSC 3.740(d) - Portal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Statement of Classification and Location/Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.