This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 02:54:58 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS HALL

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HALL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Webster, Jason W. and Pritchard, Kenneth G.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0104

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

HALL, MADALENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VLACHOS, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 11/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: No Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial; Party: Names: SYNCHRONY BANK; HALL, MADALENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 11/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less