This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:35:30 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS COSIO

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COSIO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5952

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

COSIO, ALEJANDRA LEMUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMAN, MARTIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA US MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: SYNCHRONY BANK; Awarded Against: COSIO, ALEJANDRA LEMUS; Amount; Damages: $5,146.31; Costs: $298.15; Total: $5444.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: AS TO ALEJANDRA LEMUS COSIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO ALEJANDRA LEMUS COSIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES 1 TO 10, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: proof of service of summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less