Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:39 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS CHURCHWELL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHURCHWELL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1024

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendants

CHURCHWELL, MARSHALL J

CHURCHWELL, MARSHALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, MICHAEL D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: personal, as to Marshall Churchwell aka Marshall J Churchwell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY MICHAEL D. KAHN

    Read MoreRead Less