Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:14:38 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS BAYON

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BAYON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0985

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

BAYON, ERICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, MICHAEL D

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Minute Order- Order to Show Cause CRC 3.740 1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: SYNCHRONY BANK; Awarded Against: BAYON, ERICK; Amount; Damages: $1,758.72; Costs: $292.50; Total: $2051.22; Party: Names: SYNCHRONY BANK; BAYON, ERICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN/MONEY - RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Cont'd from 1/11/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: AS TO ERICK BAYON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO ERICK BAYON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES 1 THORUGH 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Minute Order- Order to Show Cause CRC 3.740 1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substituted, as to Erick Bayon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY MICHAEL D. KAHN

    Read MoreRead Less