This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/10/2021 at 20:46:02 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS BARRETT

Case Summary

On 09/10/2014 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BARRETT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., DelPellegrino, Victoria, Woodward, Cory J., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and DelPellegrino, Victoria, Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2648

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

DelPellegrino, Victoria

Woodward, Cory J.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

DelPellegrino, Victoria, Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

BARRETT, WADE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, MICHAEL D

4545 Murphy Canyon Rd 3Fl

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

MO: 09/10/15: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Mandatory Settlement Conference

MO: Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer(s): DelPellegrino, Victoria, Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketRegister of Actions Amended - Comment: Amendment Date: 06-09-2021 Amendment Made: Remove reference to 3134 event pertaining to Confidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketStipulated Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RETAINING JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Conditional Stipulated Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Notice of settlement of entire case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - MO: Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer(s): DelPellegrino, Victoria, Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketOrder on Telephonic Appearance - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketRequest - Telephonic Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • DocketAnswer - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • Docket845W Pmt: Ltd Civil First Appearance < $10,000 GC 70614(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for BARRETT, WADE (DE-1). Received from WADE BARRETT, check no(s) 44018820. Receipt #803890 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 10, 2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT BM OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 10, 2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT BM OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for SYNCHRONY BANK (PL-1). Received from ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT PROCESSING, check no(s) 416640. Receipt #798671 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C. - MICHAEL D. KAHN