Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:42 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS ASBERRY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ASBERRY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1026

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

ASBERRY, JOYCE ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, MICHAEL D

 

Court Documents

Court Trial

03/16/16 MO - COURT TRIAL / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: T/E: 2hrs; Parties Present Plaintiff: SYNCHRONY BANK; Defendant: ASBERRY, JOYCE ANN

Case Management Conference

Minute Order- case management conference 11/12/15: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant: ASBERRY, JOYCE ANN

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: SYNCHRONY BANK; Awarded Against: ASBERRY, JOYCE ANN; Amount; Damages: $1,306.02; Costs: $292.50; Total: $1598.52; Comment: NO ATTORNEY FEES / INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Case Management Conference - 03/16/16 MO - COURT TRIAL / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: T/E: 2 hrs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Trial - 03/16/16 MO - COURT TRIAL / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: T/E: 2hrs; Parties Present Plaintiff: SYNCHRONY BANK; Defendant: ASBERRY, JOYCE ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Final Case Management Conference - Documents Submitted - Comment: by Plaintiff's counsel; Declaration of Plaintiff in Lieu of Personal Testimony at Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Notice - Comment: in lieu of subpoena to appear at trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Notice - Comment: of final case management conference and notice of trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY MICHAEL D. KAHN

    Read MoreRead Less