Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:14:41 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS ADKINS

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ADKINS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0987

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

ADKINS, GAYLENE W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, MICHAEL D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: SYNCHRONY BANK; Awarded Against: ADKINS, GAYLENE W; Amount; Damages: $1,436.75; Costs: $292.50; Total: $1729.25; Party: Names: SYNCHRONY BANK; ADKINS, GAYLENE W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: No Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: AS TO, GAYLENE WADKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION / AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2) - Comment: REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: W/O PREJUDICE AS TO DOES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO GAYLENE WADKINS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: personal, as to Gaylene Wadkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY MICHAEL D. KAHN

    Read MoreRead Less