This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/31/2021 at 14:24:39 (UTC).

SYLVAS VS CHAIREZ

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 SYLVAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHAIREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2411

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYLVAS, LONNIE

Defendants

CHAIREZ, TONY

COUNTY OF KERN, A GOVERMENT ENTITY

NATIONAL EXPRESS TRANSIT CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY

COUNTY OF KERN

CHAIREZ, LUIS ANTHONY

NATIONAL EXPRESS TRANSIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASHANI, DAVID P

Defendant Attorneys

HOLMES, KYLE W

LOWENTHAL, JOHN S

MCINTIRE, CHRISTOPHER A

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/29/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; party served does not conform to the Complaint in its entirety. Please review.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/29/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: COUNSEL FTA ON 01/29/2021

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 03/01/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 01/29/2021 AND FAILING TO FILE POS AS TO DEFENDANT TONY CHAIREZ ONLY

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Notice; Party does not conform to the Complaint. Party must conform. When you resubmit please put Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt attached behind completed Judicial Council form POS-010 and refile as one document.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; Electronic Service is improper. Authorization for Electronic Service is not on file. Please review.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/30/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: continued from 03/01/2021 & 04/30/2021

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case Management Statement (Envelope Id #6635659) Please correct the time of hearing.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case Management Statement (Envelope Id#6652645) Please correct the time of hearing.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Substitution of Attorney, form is incomplete, item 1 needs to be completed.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/30/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: continued from 06/30/2021

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case Management Statement (Envelope Id# 7041769) Please correct time to 8:15 a.m.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case Management Statement (Envelope Id# 7041841) Please correct time to 8:15 a.m.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: estimate 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 06/30/2021: Case Management Conference 08/31/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 06/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case Management Statement (Envelope Id# 7041841) Please correct time to 8:15 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case Management Statement (Envelope Id# 7041769) Please correct time to 8:15 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/30/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: continued from 03/01/2021 & 04/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/29/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint by Defendant County of Kern

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to County of Kern, A Governmental Entity via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to National Express Transit Corporation, a Business Entity via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; party served does not conform to the Complaint in its entirety. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/07/2021; Served: 12/03/202012:15 PM; Served: 12/10/202012:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/29/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL EXPRESS TRANSIT CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCINTIRE, CHRISTOPHER A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOWENTHAL JOHN S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLMES, KYLE W