This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/04/2020 at 21:42:47 (UTC).

SYCAMORE VS FOWLER

Case Summary

On 11/08/2004 SYCAMORE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FOWLER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4542

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYCAMORE GARDENS MOBILE

Defendant

FOWLER, DORIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEAKE, ALAN J

Defendant Attorney

ST LAWRENCE, ISAAC L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2004
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2004
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: New Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • DocketMemorandum to Set Court Trial Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • DocketOriginal Summons / Proof of Service - Comment: WHAT WAS SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: DORIS FOWLER AT 801 SCHIPPER AVE #54, ARVIN, CA 93203 ON 11/08/04 AT 5:41PM BY PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • DocketOriginal Summons Returned - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • DocketDefault Not Entered as Requested - Comment: ANSWER WAS FILED ON 11/15/04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2004
  • DocketAnswer - Comment: ANSWER TO: UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY: DORIS FOWLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2004
  • DocketOrder for Fee Waiver (Granted) - Comment: IN PART FILING PAPERS, SIGNED BY JUDGE GARY R. WITT 11/16/04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2004
  • DocketApplication for Waiver of Fee - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • DocketNotification Letter Mailed - Comment: TO: DORIS FOWLER RE: ACCESS TO COURT INDEX(CCP 1161.2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • Docket841B Pmt: Unlawful Detainer <$10,000 (1/1/04) - Comment: Amount of $149.30 for SYCAMORE GARDENS MOBILE (PL-1). Received from SYCAMORE GARDENS, check no(s) 19163. Receipt #132272 for amount of $149.30.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 236

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEAKE, ALAN J