Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 00:21:34 (UTC).

SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO., INC. VS TERRY

Case Summary

On 05/17/2016 SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO , INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TERRY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Stainfield, Bryan K. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0257

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO., INC.

Defendant

TERRY, AKEEM J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSMITH, MICHAEL L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketCase Destroyed Pursuant to Government Code Section - Comment: 68153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: DESTRUCTION OF RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer(s): Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Declaration RE deligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO., INC.; Awarded Against: TERRY, AKEEM J; Party: Names: SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO., INC.; TERRY, AKEEM J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO., INC.; Awarded Against: TERRY, AKEEM J; Party: Names: SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO., INC.; TERRY, AKEEM J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO., INC.; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Swift Transportation Co., LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSMITH MICHAEL L. ESQ.