This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:47:56 (UTC).

SUTTER INSURANCE VS ALMAGUER

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 SUTTER INSURANCE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ALMAGUER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Brumfield, Lorna H. and Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0413

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUTTER INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SULLIVAN, CEASAR

JOSE III ALMAGUER

HILLIARD, RONALD KEMP

ALMAGUER, JOSE III

STALLINWORTH, IRENE HILLIARD

WILSHIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

JONCES SERVICES, INC.

THOMAS, TILMER BONNER

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE; A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendants

SULIVAN, CEASAR

GOLDEN TRUCK INSURANCE BROKERAGE

JONCES SERVICES, INC.

SUTTER INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALWAYA, SEMHA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MARTELL, NICHOLAS ANTHONY

OLDAKER, DONALD C

SMITH, MICHAEL R

MICHAIL, MAUREEN M

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 12/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Order to Show Cause as to why Default Judgment has not been entered

Final Case Management Conference

Court Trial/Final Case Management Conference 05/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: t/e 1 - 2 days; same date and time as trial; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: OLDAKER, DONALD C

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 04/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: t/e 1 - 2 days fcmc & td 05/30/2017 (no jury requested); Parties Present Cross Complainant: ALMAGUER, JOSE III

Motion for Leave

Motion for Leave 04/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 3/7/17, by Intervenor, 21st Century Insurance Company. Motion for Leave of Court to Intervene. ResID: 24134.; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: OLDAKER, DONALD C

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 10/18/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: cross-defendant Sullivan has not complied w/settlement court set Further CMC to set dates as to the cross-complaint by Jose Almaguer. The complaint has been dismissed after settlement.; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: OLDAKER, DONALD C

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

04/29/16 M.O. - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: ALWAYA, SEMHA; Cross Complainant; Attorney: OLDAKER, DONALD C

Case Management Conference

03/11/16 MO: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: OLDAKER, DONALD C

Demurrer

demurrer and strike MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/10/15 Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant, Sutter Insurance Company Notice of Demurrer to Defendant and Cross-Complainant Jose III Almaguer's Cross-Complaint Transferred to Department 17 for hearing only. Department 11 is dark. ResID: 11505; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: OLDAKER, DONALD C

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO SUSAN BENSON: REJECTING E-FILING JUDGMENT PACKAGE. YOUR PAPERWORK DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE CASE NUMBER NOTED ON YOUR ENVELOPE FILING.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 07/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cross-Complainant to submit default prove-up package. Trial dates vacated.

Ruling

Ruling 04/21/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS: DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service. Must use Manditory Judicial Council Form POS-010, Proof of Service of Summons.

Motion to Amend (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to Amend (Pre-Disposition) 02/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 1/24/17, by Cross-Complainant, Jose Almaguer, III. Motion for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Cross-Complaint. ResID: 23823.; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: OLDAKER, DONALD C

Further Case Management Conference

12/13/2016 Minute Order: Further Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'f from 10/18/16; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: OLDAKER, DONALD C

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 09/20/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CRC 3.1385; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: ALWAYA, SEMHA; Cross Complainant; Attorney: OLDAKER, DONALD C

Ruling

ruling MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Held

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Order to Show Cause as to why Default Judgment has not been entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Awarded Against: Amount; Damages: $15,000.00; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,988.50; Attorney Fees: $2,750.00; Costs: $440.00; Total: $20178.50; Party: Names:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: as to Interpleader Defendant CAESAR SULLIVAN; signed by David R Lampe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: Declaration of Plaintiff Intervenor Representative in Support of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: Declaration of Susan Benson in Support of Default Judgment and Request for Attorney's Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Request for Dismissal of DOES I through V on Complaint in Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: Request for Court Judgment on Complaint in Intervention as to Ceasar Sullivan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 12/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Order to Show Cause as to why Default Judgment has not been entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Susan M. Benson in Opposition to Order to Show Cause re: Failure to Enter Default against Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
167 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Wilshire Insurance Company, a North Carolina or California Corporation; Substituted Service on 8/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO SEMHA ALWAYA RE: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE REASON: : IF TRYING TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PAGES 1 & 2 ARE NOT NECESSARY. MUST PROVIDE ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE. AS TO THE PARTY GOLDEN TRUCK INSURANCE BROKERAGE #6 MUST BE COMPLETED, MISSING CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Filing of Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: on First Amended Complaint. Returned via First Legal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Spelling of party names on summons does not match spelling on complaint. Returned via First Legal Bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/23/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less