This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 04:31:41 (UTC).

SUSZEK VS MERCIE'S DAY PROGRAM, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 SUSZEK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MERCIE'S DAY PROGRAM, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1238

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANE SUSZEK, BY AND THROUGH THE LIMITED CONSERVATORS OF HER PERSON AND ESTATE, EILEEN SUSZEK AND ROBERT SUSZEK

Defendants

MERCIE'S DAY PROGRAM, INC.

VENEGAS, PATRICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOWLER, JASON P

KAHL, RYAN K

LOWE, SEAN J.

Defendant Attorney

NORTON, GEOFFREY P

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Receipt and acknowledgment rejected: Must use mandatory form MC-356. Returned via efile

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for Deposit, filing is missing the following; Item number 1 of the form "Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account", please attach, Item number 3 is incomplete. Please correct and resubmit.

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/28/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont'd from 09/27/19

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/29/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: probate case PB57993

Minor's Compromise

Minor's Compromise 06/28/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 06/19/2019 Petitionr Eileen Suszek for Jane Suszek Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action person with Disability

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 05/31/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

Ruling

Minute Order 8/7/2018: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 07/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 05/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: MEDIATION

Ruling

Ruling 05/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 05/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 05/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike 11/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/29/17 Defendant, MERCIE'S DAY PROGRAM, INC. Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint ResID: 26980

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS; MISSING PROOF OF SERVICE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Motion - Need a substition of attorney for Patricia Venegas, she has already answered in pro per. We need first appearance fees for Mercie's Day Program.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 9/14/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketOrder to Appear - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: as to Attorney Jason Fowler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CONT 10/28/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice, entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money - Comment: in Blocked Account *Order Approving Compromise of Pending Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Receipt and acknowledgment rejected: Must use mandatory form MC-356. Returned via efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for Deposit, filing is missing the following; Item number 1 of the form "Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account", please attach, Item number 3 is incomplete. Please correct and resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/28/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont'd from 09/27/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/29/2019: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 09/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Probate case PB57933

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/29/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: probate case PB57993

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO PATRICIA VENEGAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO PATRICIA VENEGAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO PATRICIA VENEGAS, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Mercie's Day Program, Inc, sub service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 9/14/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 07/13/2017; Served: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less