This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 17:58:44 (UTC).

SUSTAITA VS. SUSTAITA

Case Summary

On 01/20/2015 SUSTAITA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SUSTAITA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McKnight, Ralph L., Jr., Camacho, Marcos R. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2092

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Camacho, Marcos R.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SUSTAITA, ASHLEY

Respondent

SUSTAITA, RAY

 

Court Documents

Motion - DCSS (Modification)

Motion - DCSS (Modification) 09/28/2017: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: SUSTAITA, ASHLEY; Respondent: SUSTAITA, RAY

Motion - DCSS (Modification)

Motion - DCSS (Modification) 10/12/2016: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 08/03/2016

Motion (DCSS)

MO 1/20/16 DCSS: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C STANDARD ORDERS 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: SUSTAITA, ASHLEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error; Comment: $85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketDCSS: Advisement of Rights Pursuant to FC 4251(b)(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Modification) - Motion - DCSS (Modification) 09/28/2017: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) - Comment: Re: NOM MOD C/S H/C S/O Hearing Date: 09282017 Hearing Time: 0800AM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Modification) - Original Type: Motion - DCSS (Modification); Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 08/03/2016 and 10/12/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Modification) - Motion - DCSS (Modification) 10/12/2016: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 08/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketDCSS: Stipulation to Continue and Order Thereon - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Modification) - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Comment: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) - Comment: Re: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 2 MINORS Hearing Date: 8/3/16 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Initial DCSS - Comment: Re: DCSS JUDGMENT MOD C/S H/C STANDARD ORDERS 2 MINORS Hearing Date: Hearing Time: Hearing Department/Division:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketNotice of Acknowledgement and Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Supplemental Summons / Complaint - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketSummons & Supplemental Complaint (DCSS) - Comment: 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO ASHLEY SUSTAITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.