Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 08:39:06 (UTC).

SUSAN PAULINE URIBE CONSERVATEE

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 SUSAN PAULINE URIBE CONSERVATEE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Myers, Brett, Kendall, Andrew and Stein, Cameryn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2685

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

Stein, Cameryn

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HIXON, CHRISTINE

HIXSON, CHRISTINE

Not Classified By Court

ALLEN, CYNTHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STOKER, IRA L

 

Court Documents

Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator

01/30/2018 MO(4): Petition for Appointment of Conservator: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - PERSON ONLY SAME NOTE- 1. Need personal service to Conservatee. 01/30/18 CALENDAR #3

Petition

(4) Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator, Appointment of Conservator and Petitions 12/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR VISITATION NOTE RE OBJECTION OF CYNTHIA ALLEN FILED 10/24/17. 1. Need proof of service to attorney, Ira L Stoker and public defender. 12/12/17 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L; Objector: ALLEN, CYNTHIA

Petition

Petition 11/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: - Petition to compel independent medical examinaton; Parties Present Petitioner: HIXSON, CHRISTINE; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L; Objector: ALLEN, CYNTHIA

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator 10/31/2017: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON ONLY SAME NOTES- 1. Need Family Court Service Report. 2. Need Capacity Declaration. 3. Frances Uribe's address on Notice of Hearing filed 08/14/17 is inconsistent with address provided on petition (2120 vs. 1120). What is Frances correct address and was she properly served. Need verified declaration/supplement. 10/31/17 CALENDAR #1

Petition

Petition 10/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE- 1. Need proof of service for proposed Conservatee, Susan Pauline Uribe.; Parties Present Petitioner: HIXSON, CHRISTINE; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

Petition for Appointment of Conservator 08/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES- 1. Need Family Court Service Report. 2. Need Capacity Declaration. 3. Frances Uribe's address on Notice of Hearing filed 08/14/17 is inconsistent with address provided on petition (2120 vs. 1120). What is Frances correct address and was she properly served. Need verified declaration/supplement.; Parties Present Petitioner: HIXON, CHRISTINE

Ruling

Ruling 07/19/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Further Hearing

Further Hearing 09/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: MEDIATION ONLY *****TO BE HEARD BY BRETT MYERS*****

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 07/19/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING further case management conference re: petition to compel independent medical examination

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/10/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Supplement to Further CMC Re: Petition to Compel Indenpendent Medical Examination

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 10/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - *****TO BE HEARD BY TEMPORARY JUDE BRETT V. MYERS*****; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L; Objector: ALLEN, CYNTHIA

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re: status/result for identifying independent medical examiner; RE: PETITION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION *****TO BE HEARD BY TEMPORARY JUDE BRETT V. MYERS*****; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L; Objector: ALLEN, CYNTHIA

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 08/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re: Petition to Compel Inependent Medical Examination; Status/result of Independent Medical Examination ***TO BE HEARD BY TEMPORARY JUDGE BRETT V. MYERS***; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L

Review

Review 07/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - re petition to appoint temporary conservator of the person only - re: status of medical and psych evaluations ***TO BE HEARD BY TEMPORARY JUDGE BRETT V. MYERS*** SAME NOTE- 1. Need personal service to Conservatee. 07/25/18 CALENDAR #3; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L; Objector: ALLEN, CYNTHIA

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

Petition for Appointment of Conservator 05/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTES- 1. Need Family Court Service Report. 2. Need Capacity Declaration. 3. Frances Uribe's address on Notice of Hearing filed 08/14/17 is inconsistent with address provided on petition (2120 vs. 1120). What is Frances correct address and was she properly served. Need verified declaration/supplement. NEW NOTE - 4. Need Independent Medical Examination (IME). 05/29/18 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L; Objector: ALLEN, CYNTHIA

Petition

Petition-Appointment of Conservator (1); Petitions (2); Petition-Appt. Temp Conservator 03/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING re: to compel independent medical examination SAME NOTE- 1. Zip code listed for Frances Uribe on Notice of Hearing filed 10/27/17 is inconsistent with zip code listed on previous petition (85240 vs 95240). SAME NOTE PERTAINS TO OBJECTIONS FILED ON 11/16/17 - 2. Zip code listed for Frances Uribe on proof of service attached to petition is inconsistent with zip code listed on previous petition (85240 vs 95240). 03/27/18 CALENDAR #4; Parties Present Petitioner: HIXSON, CHRISTINE; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L; Objector: ALLEN, CYNTHIA

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Comment: re: petition for conservatorship, petition to compel medical examination and visitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Hearing - Further Hearing 09/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: MEDIATION ONLY *****TO BE HEARD BY BRETT MYERS*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 07/19/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING further case management conference re: petition to compel independent medical examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 06/10/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Supplement to Further CMC Re: Petition to Compel Indenpendent Medical Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 04/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Stein, Cameryn; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Further CMC re Status of IME on Petition to Compel IME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 10/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - *****TO BE HEARD BY TEMPORARY JUDE BRETT V. MYERS*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 09/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re: status/result for identifying independent medical examiner; RE: PETITION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION *****TO BE HEARD BY TEMPORARY JUDE BRETT V. MYERS*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: re: petition to appoint temporary conservator of the person only ***TO BE HEARD BY TEMPORARY JUDGE BRETT V. MYERS***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: re: petition to appoint temporary conservator of the person only ***TO BE HEARD BY TEMPORARY JUDGE BRETT V. MYERS***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 08/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re: Petition to Compel Inependent Medical Examination; Status/result of Independent Medical Examination ***TO BE HEARD BY TEMPORARY JUDGE BRETT V. MYERS***

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketOrder Prescribing Notice - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 07/19/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: identification information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketReferral for Investigative Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketDuties of Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Comment: of the person

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOKER, IRA L