This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 02:14:31 (UTC).

SURGENER VS LESTER C. SURGENER II

Case Summary

On 06/14/2016 SURGENER filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against LESTER C SURGENER II. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Clark, Thomas S., Etienne, Linda S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1349

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Clark, Thomas S.

Etienne, Linda S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SURGENER, GREG

S&S OIL COMPANY, LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JOSEPH ZIEMANN, AS TRUSTEE OF THE RONALD L. SURGENER 1998 REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 24, 1998, AS AMENDED

LESTER C. SURGENER, II, SURGENER ELECTRIC, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS MCKEE ELECTRIC

SURGENER ELECTRIC, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS MCKEE ELECTRIC

SURGENER, LESTER C., II

SURGENER ELECTRIC, INC. DBA MCKEE ELECTRIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

ALEXANDER, WILLIAM L

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GARBACZ, GREGORY ANDREW

O'MEARA, FRANCES M

 

Court Documents

Motion for Judgment on Pleadings

Motion for Judgment on Pleadings 07/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/21/17 Defendant Joseph Ziemann, as Trustee Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ResID: 25095 TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 17 FOR HEARING ONLY. DEPARTMENT 4 IS DARK.

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Department Transfer

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 02/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

Ruling

Minute Order 9/14/16: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E: 6 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Same day as Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E 6 DAYS (D-4) FCMC & T/D 1/08/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on Pleadings - Motion for Judgment on Pleadings 07/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/21/17 Defendant Joseph Ziemann, as Trustee Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ResID: 25095 TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 17 FOR HEARING ONLY. DEPARTMENT 4 IS DARK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: As to Joseph Ziemann, as trustee of the Ronald L. Surgener 1998 revocable trust only, without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Department Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketPoints and Authorities - Comment: in support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Hearing Date: 7/17/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: FILED BY FRANCES M. O'MEARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Surgener Electric, Inc. personal service 6/28/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: 2nd Rejection: Proof of service page 2 6d incomplete party does not conform and missing CCP Code Returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Lester C. Surgener, II personal service 6/28/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: 2 @ Proofs of Service party served does not conform to the complaint filed. Returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/28/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/28/201611:00 AM; Served: 12/30/2016; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less