This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:50:59 (UTC).

SUNRISE VILLA PARTNERS, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS MORA

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 SUNRISE VILLA PARTNERS, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MORA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0065

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNRISE VILLA PARTNERS, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

MORA, CLAUDIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARROLL, JOSEPH W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: SUNRISE VILLA PARTNERS, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; MORA, CLAUDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CARROLL, JOSEPH W, SUNRISE VILLA PARTNERS, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 1600 POPLAR AVENUE #29 WASCO, CA 93280

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.