This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:12:20 (UTC).

SUNRIDGE NURSERIES, INC VS BROWN

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 SUNRIDGE NURSERIES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BROWN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5767

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNRIDGE NURSERIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

BROWN, JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLIFFORD, DANIEL T

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ANSWER IS INCOMPLETE.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: SUNRIDGE NURSERIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against: BROWN, JASON; Amount; Damages: $13,659.55; Attorney Fees: $2,771.15; Costs: $370.00; Other: $4,052.01; Total: $20852.71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO JASON BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Pursuant to CCP 585a in Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Pursuant to CCP 585a in support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: as to JASON BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to Does 1-20 without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Default Only as to JASON BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ANSWER IS INCOMPLETE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO JASON BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: January 18, 2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.