This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:35:16 (UTC).

SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL, LLC VS CALPINE CONTAINERS, INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CALPINE CONTAINERS, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2365

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL, LLC

Defendants

CALPINE CONTAINERS, INC

QUIMAS S.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDNER, BARRY L

Defendant Attorney

HANSEN, LISA K.

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 07/13/2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/24/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Notice of Entry of 8/29/18 Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 07/13/2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 04/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Quimas S.A. Personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO CALPINE CONTAINER, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to Calpine Containers,Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/24/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: SUMMONS RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/13/2017; Served: 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less