This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 08:05:53 (UTC).

SUN PACIFIC FARMING COOPERATIVE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS D&S AG DESIGNS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/26/2016 SUN PACIFIC FARMING COOPERATIVE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against D S AG DESIGNS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2009

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

SUN PACIFIC FARMING COOPERATIVE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WEST COAST WOOD PRESERVING, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

PRINCETON WOOD PRESERVERS, LTD., A CANADIAN LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

TIMBERLINE FOREST PRODUCTS, LLC, AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

THUNDERBOLT WOOD TREATMENT CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STOUT BUILT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PACIFIC WOOD PRESERVING OF BAKERSFIELD, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

C&R FOREST PRODUCTS, AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

D&S AG DESIGNS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NORTH AMERICAN WOOD PRESERVERS, LP, A CANADIAN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

STOUT BUILT, INC.

THUNDERBOLT WOOD TREATING CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, T MARK

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

PRITCHETT, NICK A

RUMERY, RICHARD G

HABERMAN, CHRISTOPHER L

GRIFFITH, DAVID R.

Cross Defendant Attorney

CLIFFORD, STEPHEN T

 

Court Documents

Motion for Leave

Motion for Leave 02/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/12/2018 PLAINTIFF SUN PACIFIC FARMING COOPERATIVE, INC. MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ResID: 28845; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SMITH, T MARK

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: J/T SET 3/5/18 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 4 TO 5 DAYS JURY FOR PLAINTIFF & DEFENDANT, D&S AG DESIGNS & FCMC SET 3/2/18 130 PM DEPT 11; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SMITH, T MARK; Defendant; Attorney: RUMERY, RICHARD G; Defendant; Attorney: PRITCHETT, NICK A; Cross Complainant; Attorney: PRITCHETT, NICK A

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Demurrer

Demurrer 05/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/5/17 Defendant, Timberline Forest Products, LLC. Demurrer to Complaint. ResID: 23669 Stip to continue ResID: 23961

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike 05/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/5/17, Re-noticed 1/9/17, Defendant, Timberline Forest Products, LLC. Motion to Strike Portions Plaintiffs' Complaint. ResID: 23693. Stip to continue ResID: 23960

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SMITH, T MARK; Defendant; Attorney: RUMERY, RICHARD G; Defendant; Attorney: PRITCHETT, NICK A; Cross Complainant; Attorney: PRITCHETT, NICK A

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 02/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SMITH, T MARK; Defendant; Attorney: RUMERY, RICHARD G; Defendant; Attorney: PRITCHETT, NICK A; Cross Complainant; Attorney: PRITCHETT, NICK A

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: Motion to Strike - Need Res Id - Renotice

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

12/09/16 MO; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SMITH, T MARK

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 08/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: j/t & fsc 9/24/18 9am dept 11 t/e 4-5 days jury for plaintiff & defendant D&S Ag Designs; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SMITH, T MARK

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 08/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: j/t & fsc 9/24/18 9am dept 11 t/e 4-5 days jury for plaintiff & defendant D&S Ag Designs; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SMITH, T MARK

Motion for Summary Adjudication

Motion for Summary Adjudication 08/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/5/2018 PLAINTIFF SUN PACIFIC FARMING COOPERATIVE, INC. MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ResID: 31078; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SMITH, T MARK

Debtor's Examination

Debtor's Examination 08/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to Stout Built, Inc.; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SMITH, T MARK

Motion to Enforce (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to Enforce (Pre-Disposition) 06/21/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/22/2018 PLAINTIFF SUN PACIFIC FARMING COOPERATIVE, INC. MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT STOUT BUILT, INC. ResID: 30982; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SMITH, T MARK

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ***AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY*** STIPULATION FILED 02/23/18; SEE RULING DATED 02/23/18; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SMITH, T MARK

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Richard Rumery Document: Answer to First Amended Complaint Attach Proof of Service

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Richard Rumery Document: Answer to First Amended Complaint Defendant's name does not conform to the first amended complaint on file. If the party was erroneously sued please listed true name and the erroneously sued as name. No other answer to the first amended complaint has been filed

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: FURTHER EXAMINATION OF STEVE GODINEZ REPRESENTATIVE OF D&S AG DESIGNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketRequest - Comment: Plaintiff Sun Pacific Farming Cooperative, Inc.'s Request to Take Off-Calendar Debtor's Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - Debtor's Examination 01/09/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FURHTER DEBTOR"S EXAMINATION AS TO D&S AF DESIGNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketWithdrawal From Trust Fund - Comment: Processed trust refund for $30.71 to Mark T Smith (Clifford & Brown). Completed on 11/04/19. CR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketWithdrawal From Trust Fund - Comment: Processed trust refund for $24.78 to T. Mark Smtih. Completed on 12/16/19. CR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - Debtor's Examination 12/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to D&S AG DESIGNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: re D& S Ag Designs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketWithdrawal From Trust Fund - Comment: Processed trust refund for $61.97 to T. Mark Smith. Completed on 11/25/19. CR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: Hearing Date: 12/12/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
161 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: FILED BY RICHARD RUMERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF MICHABL G. MILLER IN SUPPORT OF EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Comment: Re:Declaration of Michael G. Miller in support of extension of time in which to file responsive pleading.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to C & R FOREST PRODUCTS, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/31/2016; Served: 08/30/2016; Served: 08/30/2016; Served: 10/14/2016; Served: 10/17/2016; Served: 10/17/2016; Served: 09/08/2016; Unserved; Served: 08/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/09/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less