This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 07:20:20 (UTC).

SULLIVAN VS SULLIVAN (E)

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 SULLIVAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SULLIVAN E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3459

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SULLIVAN, KAHLA

Respondent

SULLIVAN, RODNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GORSKI, VINCENT A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes

Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes:

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketResponse - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORSKI, VINCENT A.