This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:48:19 (UTC).

SULLIVAN ET AL VS WATSON

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 SULLIVAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WATSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1600

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SULLIVAN, LATONYA

COLBERT, DARLENE

Defendant

WATSON, LOTTO

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 06/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: SULLIVAN, LATONYA; Defendant: WATSON, LOTTO; Plaintiff: COLBERT, DARLENE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Small Claims Appeal - Judgment - After Trial De Novo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Cause_of_actionCause of Action: Small Claims Appeal; Type: Action; Filed By: 11800; Filed Against: 1180011800

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action Small Claims Appeal; File Date: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: SULLIVAN, LATONYA; COLBERT, DARLENE; Awarded Against: WATSON, LOTTO; Amount; Damages: $1,907.90; Costs: $90.00; Total: $1997.90; Comment: POSSESSION OF THE VEHICLE IS TO BE RESTORED TO THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 06/01/2017: Small Claims Trial 07/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Further Hearing-Cont'd from 06/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims) SC-133 MAILED TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 06/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: AS TO LOTTO WATSON BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SULLIVAN, LATONYA; Served: 04/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER *S

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.