This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/06/2021 at 06:00:40 (UTC).

SUCCESSFUL SOLUTIONS INC VS DUNLAP

Case Summary

On 05/03/2005 SUCCESSFUL SOLUTIONS INC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DUNLAP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4665

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUCCESSFULL SOLUTIONS INC.

Defendant

DUNLAP, RAY H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAY, THOMAS M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/23/2009

DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2009

DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF: PECK & RAY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2005

Docket117 Pmt: Abstract Issued / GC 26834 - Comment: Amount of $7.00 for SUCCESSFULL SOLUTIONS INC. (PL-1). Received from PECK & RAY , LLP, check no(s) 17932. Receipt #193290 for amount of $7.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2005

DocketCase Management Conference Vacated - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2005

DocketJudgment - Comment: SIGNED BY: JUDGE GARY WITT 08/29/05

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2005

DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Court Entered - Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED: 08/29/05

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2005

DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DOES 1-10 ONLY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2005

DocketDeclaration - Comment: UNDER C.C.P. 1033 INTEREST CALCULATION; AND WAIVER OF EXCESS PRINCIPAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2005

DocketDeclaration - Comment: PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (C.C.P. 585(d))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2005

DocketDefault Entered as Requested On - Comment: DATE: 07/22/05 PARTY: AGAINST RAY H. DUNLAP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2005

DocketOriginal Summons Returned - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2005

DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY: ISAIAS MEDINA WHAT: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKAGE, CMC/OSC: CASE ASSIGNMENT OF VENUE WHEN: 05/18/05 AT 6:05PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2005

DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence Filed - Comment: UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE ON RAY H. DUNLAP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2005

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: New Notice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2005

Docket843K Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 72055 (1/1/05) - Comment: Amount of $148.30 for SUCCESSFULL SOLUTIONS INC. (PL-1). Received from SUCCESSFUL SOLUTIONS INC, check no(s) 16153. Receipt #166366 for amount of $148.30.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2005

DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 431

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2005

DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2005

DocketComplaint - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less