This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 13:25:58 (UTC).

SUASTEGUI VS MONCLOVA

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 SUASTEGUI filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against MONCLOVA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0011

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SUASTEGUI, YAHARI

Respondent

MONCLOVA, SOFIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

12/19/2022

DocketFile Type: Mail Returned Undelivered; Comment: MINUTE ORDER; Filed By: PETITIONER - SUASTEGUI, YAHARI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2022

DocketFile Type: Letter Mailed; Comment: MINUTE ORDER DATED 12/02/2022; Filed By: PETITIONER - SUASTEGUI, YAHARI|RESPONDENT - MONCLOVA, SOFIA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2022

HearingHearing Type: Petition for Harassment; Dept.: Lamont Division B; Result: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2022

DocketFile Type: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted; Comment: BY CLERK; Filed By: RESPONDENT - MONCLOVA, SOFIA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2022

DocketFile Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed By: RESPONDENT - MONCLOVA, SOFIA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2022

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service by Mail (CH-250); Comment: AS TO RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR CIVIL RESTRAINING ORDER (CH-120); Filed By: RESPONDENT - MONCLOVA, SOFIA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2022

DocketFile Type: Response to Request for Civil Restraining Order (CH-120); Filed By: RESPONDENT - MONCLOVA, SOFIA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketFile Type: Temporary Restraining Order (CH-110); Filed By: PETITIONER - SUASTEGUI, YAHARI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketFile Type: Notice of Court Hearing (CH-109); Filed By: PETITIONER - SUASTEGUI, YAHARI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketFile Type: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted; Comment: BY CLERK; Filed By: PETITIONER - SUASTEGUI, YAHARI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketFile Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed By: PETITIONER - SUASTEGUI, YAHARI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketFile Type: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (CH-100); Filed By: PETITIONER - SUASTEGUI, YAHARI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less