This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 12:00:46 (UTC).

STUART VS STUART(E)

Case Summary

On 08/09/2017 STUART filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STUART E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3456

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Defendant and Plaintiff

STUART

Petitioner

STUART, MARY E

Respondent

STUART, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HART, CARL W, Jr.

Respondent Attorney

HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 03/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 02/09/18 RES PROP CNTRL ATTY F/C SIGN DOCS **SERVICE ISSUES**; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HART, CARL W, Jr.; Respondent; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney - Comment: GEORGE R HORRIGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS: 5/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketAppearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 03/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 02/09/18 RES PROP CNTRL ATTY F/C SIGN DOCS **SERVICE ISSUES**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dr. Stuart is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORRIGAN, GEORGE R