This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 21:42:56 (UTC).

STRONG, ET AL VS TANIA GARCIA DBA BELLA ROSE, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 STRONG filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against TANIA GARCIA DBA BELLA ROSE, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0140

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STRONG, CATHY

CATHY STRONG DBA STRONG REAL ESTATE INC.

Defendant

TANIA GARCIA DBA BELLA ROSE, LLC

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 03/28/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketMotion (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, & DEFAULT JUDGMENT , AMENDED COMPLAINT TO BE FILED WITH THE COURT. MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF. Hearing Date: 4/20/17 Hearing Time: 1:30 PM Hearing Department/Division:BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/28/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: AMENDED SUMMONS & AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Entered - Comment: ALL UNNAMED TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: TANIA GARCIA DBA BELLA ROSE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE & REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: STRONG, CATHY, CATHY STRONG DBA STRONG REAL ESTATE INC.; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less