This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:19:43 (UTC).

STRIBLING VS ALIMCHANMDANI

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 STRIBLING filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALIMCHANMDANI. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6599

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRIBLING, CAROLYN

Defendants

ALIMCHANMDANI, VJAIY MANU

PARKER AVENUE TOWNHOMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • 134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $5.00 for STRIBLING, CAROLYN (PL-1). Received from STRIBLING, CAROLYN. Receipt #786173 for amount of $5.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: NO PROOF OF SERVICE FOR OEX ~ calid=2501843 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4082, CourtDate:04/28/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:4, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, SystemDate:3/13/2014 8:36:35 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • Order to Appear for Exam - Comment: ***ETIENNE***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • 116B Pmt: Filing Affidavit for Examination CCP 491.150; - Comment: Amount of $60.00 for STRIBLING, CAROLYN (PL-1). Received from OEX-CASH. Receipt #765396 for amount of $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION AS TO VIJAIY MANU ALIMCHANMDANI DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION AS TO VIJAIY MANU ALIMCHANMDANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON OEX ~ calid=2327845 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4082, CourtDate:10/02/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:GRICELDAE, SystemDate:8/16/2013 3:21:36 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Order to Appear for Exam - Comment: AS TO VIJAIY MANU ALIMCHANMDANI. **ETIENNE** ENDORSED COPY IN PRO PER BIN S

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 5/30/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • NP1500 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CAROLYN STRIBLING (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR PRINCIPAL $1025.31 PLUS COURT COSTS OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • 4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • Small Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Parties Present Plaintiff: STRIBLING, CAROLYN; Defendant: ALIMCHANMDANI, VJAIY MANU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • Small Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO VJAIY MANU ALIMCHANMDANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: NO PROOF OF SERVICE. ~ calid=2213420 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:05/30/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:LSE, Deputy:ARACELIW, SystemDate:4/9/2013 10:34:29 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: ENDORSED COPIES RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "S"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 853E Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee (More than $1,500 but not - Comment: Amount of $50.00 for STRIBLING, (PL-1). Received from COPIES. Receipt #709299 for amount of $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 609

    Read MoreRead Less