This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 04:28:23 (UTC).

STOCKDALE VS LB-UBS

Case Summary

On 05/31/2012 STOCKDALE filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against LB-UBS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6782

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STOCKDALE TOWER LLC

Defendants

LB - UBS COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE TRUST 2004 - C6, COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE PASS - THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIE

LBUBS 2004 - C6 STOCKDALE OFFICE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LBUBS 2004 - C6 STOCKDALE OFFICE GP LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LNR PJROPERTY LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LNR PARTNERS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LNR PARTNERS, INC

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY INC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

LNR PARTNERS, INC.

LB-UBS COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE TRUST 2004-C6, COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTI

LBUBS 2004-C6 STOCKDALE OFFICE GP LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LNR PROPERTY LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LBUBS 2004-C6 STOCKDALE OFFICE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOLEY

FOLEY, THOMAS G

Defendant Attorneys

EDWARDS, ANNE K

SCHNEIDER, DAVID D

GLASER, PATRICA L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2013
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: THOMAS G. FOLEY, JR (RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL) RE: STOCKDALE VS LB-UBS Case No. S-1500-CV-276782, DRL THIRD NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X_ The attached AMENDED SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT papers are being returned for the following reason(s): X_ Other: _THIRD REJECTION. THIS CASE IS DISMISSED. SUMMONS CAN NOT BE ISSUED AFTER CASE IS DISPOSED. PLEASE SEEK LEGAL ADVICE. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: THOMAS G. FOLEY, JR (RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL) RE: STOCKDALE VS LB-UBS Case No. S-1500-CV-276782, DRL THIRD NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X_ The attached AMENDED SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT papers are being returned for the following reason(s): X_ Other: _THIRD REJECTION. THIS CASE IS DISMISSED. SUMMONS CAN NOT BE ISSUED AFTER CASE IS DISPOSED. PLEASE SEEK LEGAL ADVICE. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: THOMAS G. FOLEY, JR. FOLEY BEZEK BEHLE & CURTIS, LLP 15 WEST CARRILLO STREET SANTA BARBARA, CA 93101 (RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL) RE: STOCKDALE VS LB-UBS Case No. S-1500-CV-276782, DRL NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached AMENDED CUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT papers are being returned for the following reason(s): THIS CASE IS DISMISSED. THE DISMISSAL WAS ENTERED 9/12/2012. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: THOMAS G. FOLEY, JR. FOLEY BEZEK BEHLE & CURTIS, LLP 15 WEST CARRILLO STREET SANTA BARBARA, CA 93101 (RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL) RE: STOCKDALE VS LB-UBS Case No. S-1500-CV-276782, DRL NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached AMENDED CUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT papers are being returned for the following reason(s): THIS CASE IS DISMISSED. THE DISMISSAL WAS ENTERED 9/12/2012. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: THOMAS G. FOLEY, JR. FOLEY BEZEK BEHLE & CURTIS, LLP 15 WEST CARRILLO STREET SANTA BARBARA, CA 93101 RE: STOCKDALE VS LB-UBS Case No. S-1500-CV-276782, DRL NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL is being returned for the following reason(s): DUPLICATE FILING; DISMISSAL ENTERED 9/12/2012. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: THOMAS G. FOLEY, JR. FOLEY BEZEK BEHLE & CURTIS, LLP 15 WEST CARRILLO STREET SANTA BARBARA, CA 93101 RE: STOCKDALE VS LB-UBS Case No. S-1500-CV-276782, DRL NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL is being returned for the following reason(s): DUPLICATE FILING; DISMISSAL ENTERED 9/12/2012. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: AS TO PARTY LISTED 3A AND 6D NOT A NAMED PARTY TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: DISMISSAL FILED 9/12/2012 ~ calid=1937981 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4148, CourtDate:11/28/2012, Courtroom:7, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:4, SessionType:CCM, Judge:DRL, Deputy:angelm, SystemDate:6/1/2012 2:14:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO LBUBS 2004-C6 STOCKDALE OFFICE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILLITY COMPANY SERVED 6/6/12 PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED 6/4/12 PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2012
  • DocketOrder - Comment: FURTHER STIPULATION RE THREE WEEK EXTENSION FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ANNE K. EDWARDS UPON REVIEW OF THE FOREGOING FURTHER STIPULATION RE THREE WEEK EXTENSION FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (THE "STIPULATION") AND FOR GOOD CAUSE APPEARING THEREON, IT IS HEREBY, ORDERED THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE DEADLINE FOR EACH OF THE DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED BY AN ADDITIONAL THREE WEEK PERIOD; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF IS TO GIVE NOTICE OF THIS RULING. *****DAVID R. LAMPE*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • DocketNotice - Comment: OF RULING RE EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY TWENTY-EIGHT DAYS FILED BY ANNE K. EDWARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Comment: TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY TWENTY-EIGHT DAYS FILED BY ANNE K. EDWARDS UPON REVIEW OF THE FOREGOING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY TWENTY-EIGHT DAYS (THE "STIPULATION") AND FOR GOOD CAUSE APPEARING THEREON, IT IS HEREBY, ORDERED THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE DEADLINE FOR EACH OF THE DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED BY TWENTY-EIGHT DAYS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF IS TO GIVE NOTICE OF THIS RULING. *****DAVID R. LAMPE*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • Docket185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of - Comment: Amount of $20.00 for LB-UBS COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE TRUST 2004-C6, COMME... (DE-1). Received from ACTIVE LEGAL PROCESS SOLUTIONS, check no(s) 2529. Receipt #661156 for amount of $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Docket800N Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (10/19/10) - Comment: Amount of $395.00 for STOCKDALE TOWER LLC (PL-1). Received from STOCKDALE, check no(s) 2440. Receipt #658395 for amount of $395.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • DocketNotice / Assign / Status / JES - Comment: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 7 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE ON Nov 28, 2012 AT 8:15 AM IN DEPARTMENT 7 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 7 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE ON Nov 28, 2012 AT 8:15 AM IN DEPARTMENT 7 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 13, 2012 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_7 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 13, 2012 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_7 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: THOMAS G. FOLEY JR, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 432

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.