This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:46:58 (UTC).

STILL VS WHITE

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 STILL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WHITE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0207

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STILL, CHARLES

Defendant

WHITE, ANNETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LONG, HELEN GRAYCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 9601 Grove Ave California City, CA 93505 Kern County; Party: Names: STILL, CHARLES; WHITE, ANNETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Kern County. Mail F.E.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: $33.33 of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Annette White and Unknown Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: All Unknown occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Anette White

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: STILL, CHARLES; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less