Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:52:46 (UTC).

STEWART VS TYLER

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 STEWART filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TYLER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Oglesby, John D., McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. and Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0033

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Oglesby, John D.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STEWART, CECELIA

Respondent

TYLER, TYQUANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: STEWART, CECELIA; TYLER, TYQUANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketDCSS: (Default)Judgment re Parental Obligations-Supplemental - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: DCSS - 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Comment: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketDeclaration For Amended Proposed Judgment (FL-616) - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Oglesby, John D.; Comment: STATUS ENDS:07/05/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Supplemental Summons / Complaint - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketSummons & Supplemental Complaint (DCSS) - Comment: 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: STEWART, CECELIA; Served: 07/24/20155:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less