This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 00:46:33 (UTC).

STEWARD COMPANY REAL ESTATE VS VERA

Case Summary

On 06/11/2014 STEWARD COMPANY REAL ESTATE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VERA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Errea, Larry A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9126

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Errea, Larry A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEWARD COMPANY REAL ESTATE

Defendant

VERA, JENNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(c) PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court); Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT AND ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION. FILED BY PLAINTIFF ~ calid=2594774 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4151, CourtDate:07/18/2014, Courtroom:BS, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:3, SessionType:UDT, Judge:LAE, SystemDate:6/30/2014 12:34:17 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Document Image; WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT, ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: NOTICE OF TRIAL CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON Jul 18, 2014 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. THE CASE WILL BE CALLED PROMPTLY AT THE SCHEDULED TIME. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF TRIAL CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON Jul 18, 2014 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. THE CASE WILL BE CALLED PROMPTLY AT THE SCHEDULED TIME.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: REQUEST FOR COURT TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF ~ calid=2578635 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:09/05/2014, Courtroom:BS, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:1, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LAE, SystemDate:6/11/2014 2:45:22 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Vacated - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD) - Comment: Document Image; FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Document Image; AS TO ANY PERSON CLAIMING A RIGHT TO POSSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Document Image; AS TO JENNY VERA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/18/14

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2014
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Sep 05, 2014 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for dismissal, a judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ LARRY A ERREA Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Sep 05, 2014 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for dismissal, a judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ LARRY A ERREA Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 1082 PARK LANE, SHAFTER, CA 93263

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for STEWARD COMPANY REAL ESTATE (PL-1). Received from SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK, check no(s) 1188. Receipt #783086 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN