This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 01:35:07 (UTC).

STEWARD COMPANY REAL ESTATE VS MARTINEZ, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/18/2015 STEWARD COMPANY REAL ESTATE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Camacho, Marcos R., Errea, Larry A., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0005

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Camacho, Marcos R.

Errea, Larry A.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEWARD COMPANY REAL ESTATE

Defendants

MARTINEZ, PAUL ANTHONY

PADILLA, FRANCISCA Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: STEWARD COMPANY REAL ESTATE; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 400 STACY COURT, WASCO, CA 93280; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Other: PLAITIFF IS ENTITLED TO A WRIT OF POSSESSION.; Awarded Against: MARTINEZ, PAUL ANTHONY; PADILLA, FRANCISCA Y; Party: Names: STEWARD COMPANY REAL ESTATE; MARTINEZ, PAUL ANTHONY; PADILLA, FRANCISCA Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO ANY PERSON CLAIMING ANY RIGHT TO POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO FRANCISCA Y. PADILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO PAUL ANTHONY MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: STEWARD COMPANY REAL ESTATE; Served: 05/30/20154:10 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 400 STACY COURT WASCO, CA 93280

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.