This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/06/2021 at 07:20:21 (UTC).

STENDERUP VS STENDERUP (D)

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 STENDERUP filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STENDERUP D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Marquez, Raymonda B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2523

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Marquez, Raymonda B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STENDERUP, RYAN

Respondent

STENDERUP, MADISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A

Respondent Attorney

THOMAS, EDWARD J

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Marquez, Raymonda B.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 6/8/2021 PET PROP CNTRL CONT'D FROM 7/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Marquez, Raymonda B.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 7/20/2021 RES S/S ATTY F/C PROPCNTRL STMNT OF DEC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Marquez, Raymonda B.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 6/8/2021 PET PROP CNTRL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketResponsive Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketResponse - Comment: Response and Request for Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: E-FILED: Respondent's Ex Parte Compliace for Order Shortening Time (Hrg on 07/26/21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: Request for Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: E-FILED Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: E-FILED Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORRIGAN, GEORGE R