This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 16:01:45 (UTC).

STEGALL VS STEGALL

Case Summary

On 01/25/2016 STEGALL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STEGALL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L., Fielder, John L., Benavides, Jose R. and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1252

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Fielder, John L.

Benavides, Jose R.

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STEGALL, DUSTIN

Respondent

STEGALL, ANGELA

Minor

MINORS, COUNSEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

BITTLESTON, DAWN O

SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Respondent Attorney

KIND, K WARNER

Minor Attorney

CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: JUDGMENT RET'D TO ATTY BIN

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: CONT'D FROM 6/08/17 AND 7/27/17; Parties Present Petitioner: STEGALL, DUSTIN; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L; Respondent: STEGALL, ANGELA; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER

Mandatory Settlement Conference

1/19/17 MO - MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT'D FROM 11/10/16; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Mandatory Settlement Conference

11/10/16 MO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: EST TIME 2 HRS CONT'D FROM 9/22/16

Request for Order - Respondent

7/14/16 MO REQUEST FOR ORDER - RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES C/S S/S ATTY F/C 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 6/30/16; Parties Present Petitioner: STEGALL, DUSTIN; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L; Respondent: STEGALL, ANGELA; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER; Minor's Counsel; Attorney: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Respondent

06/30/16 MO - REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES C/S S/S ATTY F/C 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 6/23/16 *ATTY ONLY*; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L; Respondent; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER

Request for Order - Petitioner

06/23/16 MO -(2) REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER/RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/C C/V PROP CNTRL/RSTRNT STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 6/8/16 *STATUS*; Parties Present Petitioner: STEGALL, DUSTIN; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L; Respondent: STEGALL, ANGELA; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER; Minor's Counsel; Attorney: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

06/08/16 MO -(2) REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER/RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V PROP CNTRL/RSTRNT STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 5/10/16; Parties Present Petitioner: STEGALL, DUSTIN; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L; Respondent: STEGALL, ANGELA; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER; Minor's Counsel; Attorney: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

04/06/16 MO - REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER Continuance: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET CC CV PROP CNTRL/RESTRAINT, & STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 3/01/16; Parties Present Petitioner: STEGALL, DUSTIN; Respondent; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER

Request for Order - Petitioner

**MO - Continuance REQUEST FOR ORDER PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V PROP CNTRL/ RESTRAINT STMNT OF DEC 3MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: STEGALL, DUSTIN; Respondent: STEGALL, ANGELA

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney - Comment: STACEY H BOWMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney - Comment: MICHAEL L SEIDMAN WITHDRAWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: SIGNED PURSUANT TO C.C.P 635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: JUDGMENT RET'D TO ATTY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: HRG DATE: 06/23/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: FOAH RET'D TO ATTY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: HEARING: 7/14/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - **MO - Continuance REQUEST FOR ORDER PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V PROP CNTRL/ RESTRAINT STMNT OF DEC 3MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketResponsive Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • DocketNo Mediation Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY FATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC PROP CNTRL PROP RES 3MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MINOR'S COUNSEL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHILDERS, STEPHANIE