This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/05/2020 at 06:18:49 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL VS NIKAS

Case Summary

On 03/24/2005 STATE FARM MUTUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NIKAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4631

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

Defendants

NIKAS, ALEXANDER

NIKAS, MISTY S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMRATH, SCOTT R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/22/2007

DocketSatisfaction of Judgment Filed - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2006

DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: 13 ABSTRACTS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2006

Docket117A Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) - Comment: Amount of $195.00 for STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE (PL-1). Received from STATE FARM MUTUAL, check no(s) 17737. Receipt #237168 for amount of $195.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2006

Docket4141 Case Management Conference - (N41a) - Comment: New Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2006

DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WHO SERVED: MISTY S. NIKAS HOW SERVED: MAIL DATE SERVED: 03/29/06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2006

DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2006

DocketCase Management Conference Vacated - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2006

DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2006

DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF MARLYS WILLCOX IN LIEU OF PERSONAL TESTIMONY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2006

DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF ROYCE WOOD IN LIEU OF PERSONAL TESTIMONY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
06/02/2005

DocketProof of Service - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL BY: MARK POLINER WHAT: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT WHEN: 05/27/05

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2005

DocketRequest for Default Entered as Requested - Comment: ON 05/20/05

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2005

DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence Filed - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2005

DocketProof of Service - Comment: MAIL/PERSONAL: SUBSTITUTE SERVICE NAME OF DOCUMENT: SUMMONS,COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF CMC GIVEN TO AMELOV NIKOLAY CO-OCCUPANT ON 04/03/05 AT 3:12PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2005

DocketOriginal Summons Returned - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2005

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: New Notice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2005

DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2005

DocketComplaint - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2005

Docket844C Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 (1/1/05) - Comment: Amount of $295.50 for STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE (PL-1). Received from STATE FARM, check no(s) 13700. Receipt #158348 for amount of $295.50.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2005

DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 236

[+] Read More [-] Read Less