This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 07:21:46 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS ZAS

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ZAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0131

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

ZAS, DOUGLAS ALFREDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GENCHEL, ROBIN F

Defendant Attorney

HUMMEL, BRIAN G

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/21/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to Douglas Alfredo Zas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Douglas Alfredo Zas via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 02/01/20201:20 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/21/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.