This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 13:13:43 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS ZAMORA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/03/2016 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ZAMORA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S., Clark, Thomas S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6002

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Clark, Thomas S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ACEVEDO, JOSE

ACEVEDO, MARIA

ZAMORA, LEOCADIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHFOUZ, RICHARD L, II

Defendant Attorney

BATES, MARK A

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 04/13/2018: Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 07/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 5/3/17; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: BATES, MARK A; Defendant; Attorney: BATES, MARK A; Defendant; Attorney: BATES, MARK A

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 05/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant: ZAMORA, LEOCADIO

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 02/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ANSWER: ATTORNEY MARK A. BATES FROM MORRIS POLICH & PURDY LAW FIRM HAS PREVIOUSLY FILED AN ANSWER FOR DEFENDANTS JOSE AND MARIA ACEVEDO ON 1/6/17.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER: FIRST APPEARANCE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME OF FILING FOR ALL ANSWERING PARTIES.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service as to Et al. is not a named person.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: AND FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 04/13/2018: Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Documents Submitted - Comment: Defendants' Exhibit List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Documents Submitted - Comment: Defendants' Witness List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Documents Submitted - Comment: Defendants' Trial Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Documents Submitted - Comment: Motion in Limine #1

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer/Response Civil Limited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER: FIRST APPEARANCE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME OF FILING FOR ALL ANSWERING PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service as to Et al. is not a named person.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: As to Jose Acevedo. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: As to Maria Acevedo. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/29/2017; Served: 12/13/2016; Served: 12/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 2/21/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less