This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:56:37 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS WHITTED

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against WHITTED. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0981

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

WHITTED, CHEYANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHFOUZ, RICHARD L, II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CS/PB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Dismissed Without Prejudice - Comment: CCP 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: on stipulation for settlement; dismissed CCP 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Stipulation - Comment: for settlement and order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Cheyanne Whitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10-26-2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY RICHARD L. MAHFOUZ II CMC 1-6-2016 8:30 AM D12

    Read MoreRead Less