This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:12:10 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS TRUJILLO

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TRUJILLO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5763

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

GT MOTORS INC

TRUJILLO, ALVARO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLEASANT, JOSEPH M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Awarded Against: TRUJILLO, ALVARO; GT MOTORS INC; Amount; Damages: $6,291.59; Pre-Judgment Interest: $118.58; Costs: $380.00; Total: $6790.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO ALVARO TRUJILLO; and GT MOTORS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Pursuant to CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: W/O Prejudice as to DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to ALVARO TRUJILLO & GT MOTORS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Default Only as to ALVARO TRUJILLO; and GT MOTORS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO ALVARO TRUJILLO, SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO GT MOTORS, SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/15/2017; Served: 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: January 17, 2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.