This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:31:10 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS SUBIA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SUBIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5919

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SUBIA, SOLEDAD VICTORIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHFOUZ, RICHARD L, II

Defendant Attorney

PEEL, JAMES W

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: January 23, 2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 12

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: JT req by all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: JT req by all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 04/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint for Subrogation Recovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: to set aside default of defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Request for Entry of Default as to Soladad Victoria Subia **SET ASIDE ON 1/5/18**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: As to Soledad Victoria Subia. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: January 23, 2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less