Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:02:47 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS NOVOA ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NOVOA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1040

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

NOVOA, GLORIA

CARPINTERO, ULISES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PILLEMER, ARNA M.

Defendant Attorney

WASSON, DAVID B

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Minute Order- Case Managment Conference 1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: CORRECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Stipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: to continue trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Notice of Trial - Comment: and Final Case Management Conference; 10/11/16, 9am, Dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Minute Order- Case Managment Conference 1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Defendant's

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: SUBSTITUTED, AS TO, GLORIA NOVOA. 9/15/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Jury Non-refundable fee pursuant to CCP 631 paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Answer to Complaint - Comment: and Demand for Trial by Jury and Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substituted, as to Ulises Carpintero

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10-27-2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY ARNA M. PILLEMER CMC 1-11-2016 8:30 AM D12

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PILLEMER ARNA MINA