This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 19:22:59 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS HERNANDEZ PONCE

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HERNANDEZ PONCE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4450

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

HERNANDEZ PONCE, MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHFOUZ, RICHARD L, II

Defendant Attorney

COZAD, JULIA P

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order Dismissing Case - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: CCP 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Comment: stipulation for settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Defendant's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 4/26/2021 @ 8:30 am in Dept. 12 as to Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Maria Hernandez Ponce via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/01/20209:04 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COZAD, JULIA P