This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:11:45 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GOMEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5756

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

GOMEZ, DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHFOUZ, RICHARD L, II

Defendant Attorney

GRANT, SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: RE: 3.110 HEARING DATE: JANUARY 16, 2018 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 12.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: To defendant's counsel Re: imposition of sanctions including striking the answer for failing to comply with CRC 3.720

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Cont'd from 04/02/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: 6/11/18 Declaration of Defense Counsel in Reponse to OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: OF LIQUIDATION AND STAY OF ACCESS GENERAL INSURANCE cOMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 6/11/18, 830am, Dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 04/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO DANIEL GOMEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO DANIEL GOMEZ, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: RE: 3.110 HEARING DATE: JANUARY 16, 2018 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.